Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gamelin

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1255SelectedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
1 Jul 1255ConfirmedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
26 Dec 1255Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
28 Apr 1271DiedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Gamelin
Bishop Gamelin (died ) Bishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Death PlaceInchmurdauch

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 89
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 7,947

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Nov 2020

Quantcast