Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Galeazzi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Montefiascone, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jan 1389AppointedBishop of Massa Marittima, Italy
10 Oct 1390AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
10 Sep 1404AppointedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
1410¹DiedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Galeazzi
Bishop Andrea Galeazzi O.F.M. (died 1410) Bishop of Montefiascone

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 348, and Page 113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Jul 2021

Quantcast