Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Fournier di Marcossey

Deceased

Bishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jun 1362AppointedBishop of Gap, France
10 Apr 1366AppointedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland
12 Jun 1377³DiedBishop of Genève {Geneva}, Switzerland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Fournier di Marcossey
Bishop Guillaume Fournier di Marcossey (died ) Bishop of Genève {Geneva}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 514, and Page 260

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 4 Mar 2021

Quantcast