Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques Fouré, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1515¹Born
16 Nov 157358.8AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
18 Apr 157459.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
20 Jan 157863.0DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacques Fouré
Bishop Jacques Fouré O.P. (born 1515, died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Saône

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainvellers
Ordained BishopDomicans, rue S. Jacques, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris
Death PlaceMâcon, Diocese of Mâcon

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 144
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1574, Number 9
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 51, Number 3,473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast