Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Noël-Joseph Foucard, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Prefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China

Titular Bishop of Zela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1830Born
17 May 185625.3Ordained PriestPriest
1859¹28.0ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
13 Aug 187847.6AppointedPrefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China
13 Aug 187847.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
23 Mar 187948.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
31 Mar 188958.2DiedPrefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi), China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Noël-Joseph Foucard
Bishop Pierre-Noël-Joseph Foucard M.E.P. (born , died ) Prefect of Kuamsi (Kwangsi, Guangxi)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlivet, Diocese of Orléans, France
Ordained BishopKong-yang
Death PlaceChang-se

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 602
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 9
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast