Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Foscari

Deceased

Bishop of Castello, Italy

Archbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras)


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Apr 1366AppointedBishop of Coron (Coronea), Greece
5 Apr 1367AppointedBishop of Castello, Italy
26 Nov 1375AppointedArchbishop of Patrae Veteres (Patras), Greece

MicroData Summary for Paolo Foscari
Bishop Paolo Foscari , Bishop of Castello

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 394, and Page 171
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast