Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Renaud de Fontaines

Deceased

Bishop of Soissons, France


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jan 1423AppointedBishop of Soissons, France
3 May 1424Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
5 Sep 1442DiedBishop of Soissons, France

MicroData Summary for Renaud de Fontaines
Bishop Renaud de Fontaines (died ) Bishop of Soissons

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,125
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 468

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast