Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernado Folcaut

Deceased

Bishop of Pamplona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Mar 1362AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
24 Jan 1364AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
7 Jun 1377DiedBishop of Pamplona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernado Folcaut
Bishop Bernado Folcaut (died ) Bishop of Pamplona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 379, and Page 387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Apr 2021

Quantcast