Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Fitzsimon

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Jun 1484AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
26 Sep 1484Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
14 May 1511DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for William Fitzsimon
Archbishop William Fitzsimon (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Dublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Death PlaceFinghall

  • a bishop for 26.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 146
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 10
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 70, Number 5,496

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast