Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domenico da Firenze, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse, France


Events

DateEventTitle
18 May 1379AppointedBishop of Albi, France
30 May 1382AppointedBishop of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
24 Oct 1392AppointedBishop of Albi, France
24 Aug 1410AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
17 Mar 1422DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for Domenico da Firenze
Archbishop Domenico da Firenze O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 488, and Page 81
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 406

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast