Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Stefano Filodori, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of CittÓ di Castello, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Mar 1539AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
16 Aug 1540Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
1554¹ResignedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
1559²DiedBishop Emeritus of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Stefano Filodori
Bishop Alessandro Stefano Filodori O.P. (died 1559) Bishop Emeritus of CittÓ di Castello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCittÓ di Castello, Diocese of CittÓ di Castello
Ordained BishopChapel of the Consecrator, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168
  • b/c2+: CB, 19 Dec 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1540, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast