Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Domingo Fernández Navarrete, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618¹Born
4 May 168264.3AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
4 Apr 168365.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
26 Feb 168668.1DiedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingo Fernández Navarrete
Archbishop Domingo Fernández Navarrete O.P. (born 1618, died ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastrojeriz
Death PlaceSantiago los Cabals

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 223, Number 1,385
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 5
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 83, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast