Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Fei

Deceased

Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Nov 1627AppointedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
21 Dec 1627Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
29 Jul 1631DiedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Fei
Bishop Lorenzo Fei (died ) Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 3.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 135
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 42
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,069

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast