Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Fani

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Mar 1667AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
21 Aug 1667Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
16 Feb 1682DiedTitular Bishop of Cyrene

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Mario Fani
Bishop Mario Fani (died ) Titular Bishop of Cyrene

  • a bishop for 14.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 172
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast