Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Falconetti, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1656Born
1 Jul 167216.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
24 Sep 167822.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
27 May 167922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Jan 170346.5AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
21 Jan 170346.5Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
29 Apr 171053.8DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Falconetti
Bishop Giacomo Falconetti O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Grosseto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiena, Archdiocese of Siena
Ordained BishopSanta Maria sopra Minerva, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceScarlino

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 213
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 28
  • ob/c2: AT, 19 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast