Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Scipione Domenico Fabbrini

Deceased

Apostolic Internuncio to Brazil


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Jan 1832¹AppointedOfficial to Brazil
28 Nov 1840AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil
7 Jan 1841DiedApostolic Internuncio to Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Scipione Domenico Fabbrini (VIAF: 304920495)
Father Scipione Domenico Fabbrini (died ) Apostolic Internuncio of Brazil

EventPlace
Death PlaceRio de Janeiro

Source(s):
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 75, and Page 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast