Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gutiérrez Bernardo de Quirós (Quiróz)

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565²Born
22 Jun 162661.4AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
14 Oct 162762.7InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
9 Feb 163873.1DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gutiérrez Bernardo de Quirós (Quiróz)
Bishop Gutiérrez Bernardo de Quirós (Quiróz) (born 1565, died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCangas de Tineo, Spain
Ordained BishopMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 148, Number 942
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 28
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast