Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Placido De Pace

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1648Born
19 Mar 167425.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Aug 170758.8AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
5 Jan 170960.2DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Placido De Pace
Bishop Giuseppe Placido De Pace (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 34.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 297
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast