Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal de Dormans

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Nov 1358AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
26 Jun 1359Ordained BishopBishop of Lisieux, France
12 Jul 1359AppointedBishop of Beauvais, France
22 Jun 1360InstalledBishop of Beauvais, France
22 Sep 1368AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
22 Sep 1368Elevated to Cardinal
7 Nov 1373DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Jean de Dormans
Jean Cardinal de Dormans (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDormans, Diocese of Soissons, France
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris, France
Buried Place (Original)Carthusians, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris, France

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
  • a cardinal for 5.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 304, and Page 132
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast