Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre d’Orgemont

Deceased

Bishop of Paris, France


Events

DateEventTitle
26 May 1376AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
19 Jan 1384AppointedBishop of Paris, France
16 Jul 1409DiedBishop of Paris, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’Orgemont
Bishop Pierre d’Orgemont (died ) Bishop of Paris

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 351, and Page 391

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Feb 2021

Quantcast