Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alamanno Donati, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Modena, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Oct 1330AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
18 Jul 1342AppointedBishop of Modena, Italy
4 Jun 1352DiedBishop of Modena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alamanno Donati
Bishop Alamanno Donati O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Modena

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 466, and Page 353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 24 May 2021

Quantcast