Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Joannis, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ariano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Mar 1363AppointedBishop of Hierapetra, Greece
13 Mar 1364AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
11 Jun 1386AppointedBishop of Ariano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Joannis
Bishop Domenico Joannis O. Carm. , Bishop of Ariano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 352, and Page 106
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 274

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Jul 2021

Quantcast