Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bl. Pierre de Luxembourg

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Metz, France

Cardinal-Priest of San Giorgio in Velabro

Note/Previous Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1369Born
10 Feb 138414.5AppointedBishop of Metz, France
15 Apr 138414.7AppointedAdministrator of Metz, France
15 Apr 138414.7Elevated to Cardinal
15 Apr 138414.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giorgio in Velabro
2 Jul 138717.9DiedAdministrator of Metz, France
24 Mar 1527³Beatified

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bl. Pierre de Luxembourg
Bishop Bl. Pierre de Luxembourg (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLigny-en-Barrois, Meuse
Death PlaceVilleneuve-lès-Avigno
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Villeneuve-lès-Avigno
Buried Place (Current)Pope St. Celestine V, Church

  • a cardinal for 3.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 338
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast