Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miles d’Illiers

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chartres, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1410²Born
31 Aug 145949.6AppointedBishop of Chartres, France
8 Sep 145949.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chartres, France
3 Dec 149282.9ResignedBishop of Chartres, France
27 Sep 149383.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Chartres, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miles d’Illiers
Bishop Miles d’Illiers (born 1410, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chartres

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Girolamo, Church, Mantova, Diocese of Mantova, Italy

  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 119
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1459, Number 5
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 42, Number 2,752
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,390

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast