Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume d’Estouteville

Deceased

Bishop of Lisieux, France


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Feb 1375AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
12 Nov 1376AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
11 Aug 1382AppointedBishop of Lisieux, France
10 Jan 1415DiedBishop of Lisieux, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume d’Estouteville
Bishop Guillaume d’Estouteville (died ) Bishop of Lisieux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 304, and Page 120
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 234

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast