Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre d’Estaing, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1320¹Born
19 Nov 136141.8AppointedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
2 Apr 136848.2AppointedArchbishop of Bourges, France
7 Jun 137050.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
7 Jun 137050.4Elevated to Cardinal
28 Sep 137353.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
18 Nov 1377³57.8DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre d’Estaing
Archbishop Pierre d’Estaing O.S.B. (born 1320, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

EventPlace
Birth Placed’Estaing, Château, near Espalion, Diocese of Rodez, France
Death PlaceS. Maria in Trastevere, Palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Trastevere, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 7.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 251, and Page 139
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Feb 2021

Quantcast