Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Alonso de Solis y Mendoza, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1574Born
11 Jan 163560.5SelectedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
1 Sep 163662.2ConfirmedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
Aug 1637³63.1Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)
19 Apr 164166.8DiedBishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Alonso de Solis y Mendoza
Bishop Juan Alonso de Solis y Mendoza O. Carm. (born , died ) Bishop of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalamanca, Diocese of Salamanca, Spain
Ordained BishopSanto Domingo, Archdiocese of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
Death PlaceSan Juan, Diocese of Puerto Rico (Porto Rico)

  • a bishop for 3.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 286
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 164, Number 1,034
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 38
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Number 3,347
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,061

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast