Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alonso de So de Castro y Pinós

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca, Spain

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Oct 1519AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
12 Oct 1519AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
27 Mar 1527AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
12 Oct 1530DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alonso de So de Castro y Pinós
Bishop Alonso de So de Castro y Pinós (died ) Bishop of Huesca

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 33, Number 139
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 264
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1519, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast