Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramon de Descatllar i de Palasol, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Sep 1408AppointedBishop of Elne, France
19 Dec 1408AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
5 May 1415DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Ramon de Descatllar i de Palasol
Bishop Ramon de Descatllar i de Palasol O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Gerona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 239, and Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast