Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bertrand Cardinal des Bordes

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1308AppointedBishop of Albi, France
19 Dec 1310AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
19 Dec 1310Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 1311DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

MicroData Summary for Bertrand des Bordes
Bertrand Cardinal des Bordes (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGascogne, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Notre Dame de Uzeste, Church, Avignon

  • a cardinal for .7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1310
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 81

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast