Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father James Dempsey

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Apr 1657AppointedVicar Apostolic of Dublin, Ireland
24 Nov 1665ResignedVicar Apostolic of Dublin, Ireland
24 Nov 1665AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kildare, Ireland
23 Jan 1667³DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dublin, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for James Dempsey
Father James Dempsey (died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Dublin

Source(s):
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast