Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pierre Cardinal de Cros

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Aug 1344AppointedBishop of Senlis, France
1 Dec 1349AppointedBishop of Auxerre, France
17 Dec 1350AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
17 Dec 1350Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 1361DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Cros
Pierre Cardinal de Cros (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalimafort, Diocese of Limoges, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 10.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 452
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Feb 2021

Quantcast