Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo de Curtis, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Isernia, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Apr 1591AppointedBishop of Ravello, Italy
May 1598³AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
15 Mar 1600AppointedBishop of Isernia, Italy
11 Oct 1600ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1606¹ResignedBishop of Isernia, Italy
9 Jan 1621AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1 Apr 1622ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
1629²DiedBishop Emeritus of Isernia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo de Curtis
Bishop Paolo de Curtis C.R. (died 1629) Bishop of Isernia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 211
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1591, Number 18*
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast