Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre de Cros

Deceased

Bishop of Clermont, France


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Jan 1302AppointedBishop of Clermont, France
12 Nov 1302Ordained BishopBishop of Clermont, France
25 Sep 1304DiedBishop of Clermont, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Cros
Bishop Pierre de Cros (died ) Bishop of Clermont

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 1.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 192
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 102, Number 8,800

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 22 Dec 2020

Quantcast