Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Géraud du Breuil

Deceased

Bishop of Uzés, France


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Apr 1383AppointedBishop of Apt, France
17 Oct 1390AppointedBishop of (Saint-Lizier de) Couserans (or Conserans), France
18 Sep 1405AppointedBishop of Uzés, France
1425¹DiedBishop of Uzés, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Géraud du Breuil
Bishop Géraud du Breuil (died 1425) Bishop of Uzés

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 96, and Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 511

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Feb 2021

Quantcast