Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean Cardinal d’Armagnac

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen, France

Administrator of Auch

Note/Previous Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1350¹Born
22 Apr 138737.3AppointedBishop of Mende, France
17 Oct 139040.7AppointedArchbishop of Auch, France
26 Feb 140757.1AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
22 Sep 140858.7AppointedAdministrator of Auch, France
22 Sep 140858.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 140858.7AppointedCardinal-Priest
8 Oct 140858.7DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Armagnac
Jean Cardinal d’Armagnac (born 1350, died ) Archbishop of Rouen

EventPlace
Death PlacePerpignan

  • a cardinal for -.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Sep 1408
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 426, and Page 121
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 342

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Feb 2021

Quantcast