Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Darlington, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Dublin, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Feb 1279AppointedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
27 Aug 1279Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland
28 Mar 1284DiedArchbishop of Dublin, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Darlington
Archbishop John Darlington O.P. (died ) Archbishop of Dublin

EventPlace
Ordained BishopWaltham, Abbey

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 65
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,900

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast