Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Archery

Deceased

Bishop of Senlis, France


Events

DateEventTitle
10 May 1415SelectedBishop of Senlis, France
3 Jun 1415ConfirmedBishop of Senlis, France
12 Jun 1419DiedBishop of Senlis, France

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Archery
Bishop Jean d’Archery (died ) Bishop of Senlis

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Feb 2021

Quantcast