Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando D’Anna

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Oct 1521AppointedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
21 Oct 1530AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
13 May 1541AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Bovino, Italy
1565DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando D’Anna
Bishop Ferdinando D’Anna (died 1565) Bishop of Bovino

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 105, and Page 147
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 135
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1521, Number 33*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast