Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan de Andreis

Deceased

Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1615¹Born
16 Mar 166752.2AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
27 Apr 167661.3AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
29 May 168368.4DiedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ivan de Andreis (VIAF: 305551566)
Bishop Ivan de Andreis (born 1615, died ) Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTra¨, Diocese of Trogir (Tra¨)
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 278
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1667, Number 6
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,192

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast