Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Faydit d’Aigrefeuille, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Feb 1358Ordained PriestPriest
2 Aug 1361AppointedBishop of Rodez, France
22 Jul 1365InstalledBishop of Rodez, France
18 Jul 1371AppointedBishop of Avignon, France
23 Dec 1383AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
23 Dec 1383Elevated to Cardinal
2 Oct 1391DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Faydit d’Aigrefeuille
Bishop Faydit d’Aigrefeuille O.S.B. (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimousin, France
Death PlaceAvignon, Diocese of Avignon, France
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame des Doms, Cathedral, Avignon, Diocese of Avignon, France

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a cardinal for 7.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 427, and Page 124
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Dec 1383

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast