Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ottavio Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1609Born
2 Mar 165444.4Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 165444.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
18 Mar 165848.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
26 Sep 167465.0DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

MicroData Summary for Ottavio Acquaviva d’Aragona (Jr.) (VIAF: 89105367)
Ottavio Cardinal Acquaviva d’Aragona (Jr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 20.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Mar 1654

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast