Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques de Croy, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cambrai, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1478Born
1 Feb 150325.0AppointedBishop of Cambrai, France
17 May 150628.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cambrai, France
15 Aug 151638.6DiedBishop of Cambrai, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques de Croy
Bishop Jacques de Croy O.S.B. (born 1478, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cambrai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNetherlands
Ordained BishopLa Chartreuse, Louvain
Death PlaceRicltertre, Château, Brabant

  • a bishop for 10.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 148
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 23, Number 45
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 115
  • b/c3: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1506, Number 4
  • ob/c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,267
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 79, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast