Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giambattista Cardinal Costaguti

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1636Born
13 Feb 169054.1Elevated to Cardinal
10 Apr 169054.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bernardo alle Terme
12 Nov 169155.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
8 Mar 170468.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Costaguti
Giambattista Cardinal Costaguti (born 1636, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 14.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast