Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bertrand Cardinal de Cosnac, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1300¹Born
17 Sep 134848.7AppointedBishop of Lombez, France
17 Oct 135252.7AppointedBishop of (Saint-Bertrand de) Comminges, France
30 May 137171.4AppointedCardinal-Priest
30 May 137171.4Elevated to Cardinal
Mar 1372³72.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
17 Jun 137474.4DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bertrand de Cosnac
Bertrand Cardinal de Cosnac C.R.S.A. (born 1300, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrive
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Dominicans, Church, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 3.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 May 1371
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 310, and Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast