Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cosmas , O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Zarew (Saraj), Russian Federation

Note/Previous Titular See: from Traphasson; to Tanen


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jun 1362AppointedArchbishop of Zarew (Saraj), Russian Federation
1369¹AppointedArchbishop of Cambaluc (Peking, Khanbaliq), China
20 Mar 1370AppointedArchbishop of Zarew (Saraj), Russian Federation

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cosmas
Archbishop Cosmas O.F.M. , Archbishop of Zarew (Saraj)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 160, and Page 434
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 471
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 28 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast