Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Marcelo Corni Velazquez

Deceased

Bishop of Trujillo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1564²Born
18 Oct 161854.7AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
17 Aug 162056.6AppointedBishop of Trujillo, Peru
18 Oct 162056.7Ordained BishopBishop of Trujillo, Peru
16 Oct 163066.7DiedBishop of Trujillo, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlos Marcelo Corni Velazquez
Bishop Carlos Marcelo Corni Velazquez (born 1564, died ) Bishop of Trujillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrujillo
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima

  • a bishop for 9.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,703
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 158, and Page 347
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1620, Number 13
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,091

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast