Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Cori (de Coris)

Deceased

Bishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1656AppointedBishop of Nardň, Italy
12 Mar 1656Ordained BishopBishop of Nardň, Italy
17 Jun 1669AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
1672²DiedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Cori (de Coris)
Bishop Girolamo Cori (de Coris) (died 1672) Bishop of Sovana (Soana)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Caterina da Siena in via Giulia, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 364
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 257
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: AT, 27 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 28 Nov 2020

Quantcast