Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Corbridge

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Nov 1299SelectedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
28 Feb 1300Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
22 Sep 1304DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Corbridge
Archbishop Thomas Corbridge (died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 4.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 233
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 69
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 104
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast