Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Cino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Recanati, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Jul 1385AppointedBishop of Recanati, Italy
19 Sep 1408Elevated to Cardinal
19 Sep 1408AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santo Stefano al Monte Celio
9 Sep 1409ResignedBishop of Recanati, Italy
21 Jun 1412DiedBishop Emeritus of Recanati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Cino
Angelo Cardinal Cino (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Recanati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBavagna, Umbria
Death PlacePisa
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Recanati, Diocese of Recanati

  • a cardinal for 3.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 411
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Sep 1408

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Aug 2021

Quantcast